VA HB399 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Manufacture, import, sale, transfer, or possession of plastic firearms and unfinished frames or receivers and unserialized firearms; penalties. Creates a Class 5 felony for any person who manufactures, imports, sells, transfers, or possesses any firearm with a major component, as defined in the bill, that when subjected to inspection by the types of detection devices, including X-ray machines, commonly used at airports for security screening does not generate an image that accurately depicts the shape of the component. The bill updates language regarding the types of detection devices that are used at airports for detecting plastic firearms. Manufacture, import, sale, transfer, or possession of plastic firearms and unfinished frames or receivers and unserialized firearms; penalties. Creates a Class 5 felony for any person who manufactures, imports, sells, transfers, or possesses any firearm with a major component, as defined in the bill, that when subjected to inspection by the types of detection devices, including X-ray machines, commonly used at airports for security screening does not generate an image that accurately depicts the shape of the component. The bill updates language regarding the types of detection devices that are used at airports for detecting plastic firearms. The bill also creates several Class 1 misdemeanors, which are punishable as a Class 4 felony for a second or subsequent offense, making it unlawful (i) for any person to knowingly possess, transport, or receive an unfinished frame or receiver unless the party possessing or receiving the unfinished frame or receiver is a federal firearms importer, manufacturer, or dealer or the unfinished frame or receiver is required by federal law to be, and has been, imprinted with a serial number by a federal firearms importer, manufacturer, or dealer and (ii) for any person to knowingly sell, offer to sell, transfer, or purchase an unfinished frame or receiver unless the party selling, offering to sell, transferring, or purchasing the unfinished frame or receiver is a federal firearms importer, manufacturer, or dealer or the unfinished frame or receiver is required by federal law to be, and has been, imprinted with a serial number by a federal firearms importer, manufacturer, or dealer. The provisions related to the prohibition for possessing, transporting, or receiving an unfinished frame or receiver have a delayed effected date of January 1, 2023.
Title
Plastic firearms and unfinished frames, etc.; manufacture, import, sale, transfer, etc., penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103868D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.5:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |