VA HB399 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bear, deer, and wildlife kill permits. Requires any person who kills a bear, deer, or other wildlife pursuant to a kill permit issued by the Director of the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries to utilize the animal only for human consumption. Such practices as mounting or displaying the carcass in some other manner are prohibited. In addition, if the animal is not going to be consumed, it must be disposed of within 24 hours.
Title
Bear, deer, & wildlife kill permits; utilize bear, deer, & wildlife only for human consumption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005) | |
2010-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 5 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-02-17 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-02-17 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB399ER) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-29 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB399H1 | |
2010-01-29 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104521D-H1 | |
2010-01-29 | House: Read second time | |
2010-01-28 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-27 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104521D-H1 | |
2010-01-27 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100765D |