VA HB396 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Corporation Commission; assistance with foreign insurance policies. Authorizes the State Corporation Commission to assist consumers and to examine and investigate complaints and inquiries relating to trade practices and claim settlement practices of insurers involving certain group accident and sickness insurance policies issued outside of the Commonwealth but covering residents of the Commonwealth.
Title
State Corporation Commission; assistance with foreign insurance policies.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 256 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB396ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-16 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101277D |