VA HB396 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - House: Continued to 2013 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - House: Continued to 2013 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Invasive plants. Instructs the Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services to adopt regulations for the control of invasive plants. The bill classifies invasive plants as belonging to one of two tiers, depending upon whether the plant is widely disseminated in Virginia. Any activity involving a tier 1 invasive plant would be prohibited without written approval, while the provision of tier 2 invasive plants to consumers by nurseries and landscaping services would be permitted if the provider were to clearly identify the plants as tier 2 invasive plants.
Title
Invasive plants; Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services to adopt regulations to control.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | House: Continued to 2013 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote | |
2012-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote | |
2012-01-18 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100181D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB396 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB396+hil |