VA HB393 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Landlord and tenant; tenant rights and responsibilities. Requires the Director of the Department of Housing and Community Development to develop a statement of tenant rights and responsibilities explaining in plain language the rights and responsibilities of tenants under the Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act (§ 55.1-1200 et seq.) and maintain such statement on the Department's website along with a form to be signed by the parties to a rental agreement. The bill requires that the statement be provided to any prospective tenant and that the form developed by the Department be signed by the parties to the rental agreement. The bill prohibits a landlord from filing or maintaining an action against a tenant in a court of law for any alleged lease violation until he has provided the tenant with the statement of tenant rights and responsibilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord and tenant; statement of tenant rights and responsibilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 6-N) (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (70-Y 27-N) (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB393ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-07HouseVOTE: Adoption (64-Y 35-N)
2020-03-07HouseConference report agreed to by House (64-Y 35-N)
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (29-Y 10-N)
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05SenateSenators: McClellan, Hashmi, Kiggans
2020-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-04HouseDelegates: Ward, Simon, Miyares
2020-03-04HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-04HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-03-03SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-03-03SenateSenate insisted on substitute (38-Y 2-N)
2020-03-02HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N)
2020-03-02HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 20109168D-S1 (0-Y 100-N)
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-28SenatePassed Senate with substitute (31-Y 6-N)
2020-02-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB393S1
2020-02-28SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20109168D-S1
2020-02-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-28SenateRead third time
2020-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26SenateCommittee substitute printed 20109168D-S1
2020-02-26SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
2020-02-19SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Passage (70-Y 27-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House (70-Y 27-N)
2020-02-07HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB393H1
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107130D-H1
2020-02-07HouseRead second time
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2020-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-04HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107130D-H1
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2020-01-02HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-02HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101625D

Same As/Similar To

SB707 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511204(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB393&201+sum+HB393
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB393+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB393H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB393S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB393ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1102V0056+HB0393
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1102V0083+HB0393
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0233+HB0393
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0201V0027+HB0393
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0138+HB0393
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0191+HB0393
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0733+HB0393
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0205+HB0393
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0471+HB0393
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1203HB0393+HB0393
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1275HB0393+HB0393
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1690+HB0393
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1400HB0393+HB0393
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1704HB0393+HB0393
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2069+HB0393

Bill Comments

feedback