VA HB391 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Statewide Building Code; enforcement; inspection warrants; hoarding. Expands the circumstances in which an inspection warrant may be issued by a magistrate or court of competent jurisdiction to a local building official or his agent to include instances in which a local building department has received a complaint that a violation of the unsafe structures provisions of the Building Code exists due to documented prolonged and extensive hoarding by the owner, tenant, or occupant of any building, and the owner, tenant, or occupant has refused to allow the local building official or his agent access to such building or structure. The bill defines "hoarding" as the acquisition and retention of large quantities of items and materials that produce an extensively cluttered living space, which significantly impairs the performance of essential self-care tasks or otherwise substantially threatens health, life, or safety.
Title
Uniform Statewide Building Code; enforcement, inspection warrants, hoarding.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in General Laws |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102211D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB391 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB391+hil |