VA HB39 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]


Local alternative minimum wage. Establishes a procedure by which a local alternative minimum wage may be imposed in any locality. If imposed by ordinance of the local governing body, the alternative minimum wage requirement shall become effective on the July 1 that follows delivery of a certified copy of the ordinance to the Commissioner of Labor and Industry. A local alternative minimum wage requires every employer to pay to each of his employees, for work performed by them within the locality, wages at a rate to be determined by local ordinance beginning July 1, 2019. In subsequent fiscal years, the maximum local alternative minimum wage shall be adjusted based on changes in the consumer price index. If the federal minimum wage exceeds the levels specified in an alternative local minimum wage requirement, the federal minimum wage will prevail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Minimum wage, local alternative; establishes procedure by which wage may be imposed in any locality.



2018-02-13HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-02-06HouseReferred from Rules by voice vote
2017-11-29HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2017-11-29HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101018D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40128.10(n/a)See Bill Text
40128.9(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments