VA HB389 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0524)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0524)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Early childhood care and education; regional entities; Child Care Subsidy Program Overpayment Fund established. Requires the Board of Education to establish a system of regional entities that will be responsible for coordinating early childhood care and education services, guiding quality improvement of such services and coordinated access to such services for families, and implementing the uniform measurement and improvement system. The bill establishes the Child Care Subsidy Program Overpayment Fund, consisting of all overpayment moneys collected or recovered by the Department of Education or any state or local agency contracted to administer the Child Care Subsidy Program, net of any refunds due to the federal government, to be used solely for the purpose of covering the cost of providing training and supports to early childhood care and education entities.
Title
Early childhood care and education; regional entities, Child Care Subsidy Program Overpayment Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 31-N) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 31-N) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0524) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 524 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB389ER) |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (68-Y 31-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (68-Y 31-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104067D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 289.05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.08:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |