VA HB388 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0295)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0295)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State facilities; video visitation. Requires the director of every state facility to establish a process to facilitate virtual visitation through the use of audio and video equipment for individuals receiving services at the state facility. State facilities; video visitation. Requires the director of every state facility to establish a process to facilitate virtual visitation through the use of audio and video equipment for individuals receiving services at the state facility.
Title
State facilities; video visitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0295) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 295 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB388ER) |
2022-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22106761D-S1 (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB388S1 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106761D-S1 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106761D-S1 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103639D |