VA HB388 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0590)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0590)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uninsured motor vehicle fee payment plan. Allows the Department of Motor Vehicles to establish an uninsured motor vehicle fee payment plan to allow individuals to pay the $500 uninsured motor vehicle fee through an installment plan with the Department, when their driver's license and vehicle registration have been suspended as a result of failure to pay the uninsured motor vehicle fee. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2017.
Title
Uninsured motor vehicle fee payment plan; DMV may establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0590) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 590 (effective 1/1/17) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB388ER) |
2016-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-28 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100483D |