VA HB387 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Tax credit for vehicle emissions testing equipment; certain vehicles. Allows a corporation, individual, or public service corporation a tax credit equal to 10 percent of the purchase price of a vehicle with an internal combustion engine that is principally garaged in Virginia. Current law allows such a credit only for certain clean-fuel vehicles.
Title
Vehicle emissions testing equipment; tax credit for certain vehicles.
Sponsors
Del. Tim Griffin [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Finance |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103307D |