VA HB383 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Law-Enforcement Officer Tuition Grant Fund and Program. Law-Enforcement Officer Tuition Grant Fund and Program. Establishes the Law-Enforcement Officer Tuition Grant Fund and requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to establish the Law-Enforcement Officer Tuition Grant Program for the purpose of providing grants from the Fund on a competitive basis to local law-enforcement agencies to cover the cost of tuition, books, and mandatory fees at a public institution of higher education for up to two years for any law-enforcement officer employed by such agency who enters into an agreement to continue to serve as a law-enforcement officer for such agency upon completion of his course of study for a period at least as long as the length of the course of study undertaken and paid for pursuant to the Program. The Fund and Program replace a similar provision of current law whereby the Department of Criminal Justice Services enters into contracts to make payments directly to certain public and private institutions of higher education to cover the cost of tuition, books, and mandatory fees for state and local law-enforcement officers who enroll in a program of study relating to their law-enforcement duties. The bill requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to report to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations, the House Committee on Education, the Senate Committee on Finance, and the Senate Committee on Education and Health no later than September 1, 2024, on the funding, utilization, and effectiveness of the Fund
Title
Law-Enforcement Officer Tuition Grant Fund and Program; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101698D |