VA HB377 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adjustment or relocation of billboard signs. Includes the erection of a sound barrier as an action that allows relocation of a billboard sign. The bill also allows a billboard to remain in its original location until the Commissioner of Highways or other condemnor gives notice to its owner that the sign must be removed.
Title
Billboard signs; adjustment or relocation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (29-Y 67-N) (Y: 29 N: 69 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 37-N) (Y: 64 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 37-N) (Y: 64 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811) | |
2014-05-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 811 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (29-Y 67-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation (29-Y 67-N) |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2014-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB377ER) |
2014-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (6-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 37-N) |
2014-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (62-Y 37-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB377H1 |
2014-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104470D-H1 |
2014-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104470D-H1 |
2014-01-30 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 7-N) |
2014-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102619D |
Same As/Similar To
SB295 (Same As) 2014-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0298)