VA HB374 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Lottery Board; regulation of casino gaming. Authorizes casino gaming in the Commonwealth to be regulated by the Virginia Lottery Board. Casino gaming shall be limited to certain cities that meet the criteria that is outlined in the bill, and a referendum must be passed in the city on the question of allowing casino gaming in the city. This bill is a reenactment of the first enactment of Senate Bill 1126 of the 2019 legislative session.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lottery Board; regulation of casino gaming.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06HouseIncorporated by General Laws
2020-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends incorporating (HB4-Knight) by voice vote
2020-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming
2020-01-02HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-02HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104478D

Same As/Similar To

HB4 (Similar To) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1197)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182334.5(n/a)See Bill Text
192389(n/a)See Bill Text
223711(n/a)See Bill Text
5814002(n/a)See Bill Text
5814006(n/a)See Bill Text
5814100(n/a)See Bill Text
5814101(n/a)See Bill Text
591364(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback