VA HB371 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - VOTE: DEFEATED (45-Y 52-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - VOTE: DEFEATED (45-Y 52-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Adoption by stepparent; background check. Repeals the July 1, 2020, sunset on provisions that require a circuit court, when determining whether an investigation by the director of the local department of social services should be required before a final order is entered to approve as an adoptive parent the spouse of a child's birth or adoptive parent, to consider the results of a national criminal history background check conducted on the prospective adoptive parent.
Title
Adoption by stepparent; circuit court shall consider results of background check.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (45-Y 52-N) (Y: 45 N: 52 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (45-Y 52-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read third time and defeated by House (45-Y 52-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB371H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106243D-H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-27 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106243D-H1 |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102504D |