VA HB371 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sexual harassment training; legislative branch. Requires General Assembly members, full-time legislative staff of General Assembly members compensated with state appropriations, and full-time employees of each legislative branch agency to complete sexual harassment training once every two calendar years. Training offered by the Office of the Clerk of the House of Delegates and the Office of the Clerk of the Senate must be substantially similar and provided to their respective members and their staff. All other legislative branch employees shall complete the sexual harassment training course offered by either Clerk. The training must be available online 24 hours per day, seven days per week and be substantially similar to any sexual harassment training course offered through the Commonwealth of Virginia Learning Center administered by the Department of Human Resource Management. Persons elected to the General Assembly or commencing or recommencing full-time employment in the legislative branch will have 90 days from the election or their dates of hire to complete the training unless the person previously completed such training earlier in the same calendar year. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2019. This bill incorporates HB 1057 and is identical to SB 796.
Title
Sexual harassment training; requirement for legislative branch.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (6-Y 90-N) (Y: 6 N: 90 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASS BY (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASS BY (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASS BY (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (6-Y 90-N) (Y: 6 N: 90 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASS BY (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASS BY (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASS BY (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777) | |
2018-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 777 (effective 1/1/19) | |
2018-03-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB371ER) |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-09 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 6-N) |
2018-03-09 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (91-Y 6-N) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-09 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senators: Sturtevant, Dunnavant, Dance |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Delegates: Robinson, Gilbert, Herring |
2018-03-08 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-08 | House | House acceded to request |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (6-Y 90-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 18107610D-S1 (6-Y 90-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB371S1 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107610D-S1 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107610D-S1 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-01 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (88-Y 10-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB371H1 |
2018-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASS BY (50-Y 49-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment #3 by Delegate Watts passed by (50-Y 49-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASS BY (50-Y 49-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment #2 by Delegate Watts passed by (50-Y 49-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASS BY (50-Y 49-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment #1 by Delegate Watts passed by (50-Y 49-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 49-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to (50-Y 49-N) 18106017D-H1 |
2018-01-31 | House | Substitute by Delegate Watts out of order 18106422D-H2 |
2018-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-31 | House | Floor substitute printed 18106422D-H2 (Watts) |
2018-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-26 | House | Incorporates HB1057 (Watts) |
2018-01-26 | House | Substitute bill reprinted 18106017D-H1 |
2018-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106017D-H1 |
2018-01-26 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101327D |