VA HB37 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Loan repayment programs; mental health professionals. Creates a loan repayment program for persons who have worked as mental health professionals in the Commonwealth for at least five years.
Title
Loan repayment programs; creates program for mental health professionals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with amendment(s) (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with amendment(s) (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2024-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-23 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services with amendment(s) (18-Y 4-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned sub: Health Professions |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2023-12-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101238D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 122.6:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 122.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |