VA HB37 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; stills or distilling apparatuses; permit requirement. Narrows the requirement that a permit be obtained from the Board of Directors of the Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority in order to keep, store, or possess any still or distilling apparatus to include only instances in which a still or distilling apparatus is kept, stored, or possessed for the purpose of distilling alcohol.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; stills or distilling apparatuses, permit requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386) | |
2020-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 386 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB37ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: ABC |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-29 | House | VOTE: Passage (88-Y 10-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (88-Y 10-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-11-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100989D |