VA HB37 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Nonpayment of wages; private action. Affirms that an employee has cause of action against an employer who fails to pay wages to recover the wages and prejudgment interest at eight percent annually from the date the wages were due. The measure provides that if the court finds that the employer knowingly failed to pay the wages, it shall also award the employee reasonable attorney fees and court costs. If the court finds that the employer's failure to pay wages was willful and with intent to defraud the employee, the court shall also award the employee reasonable attorney fees and court costs plus an additional sum equal to the amount of wages due.
Title
Wages; cause of action against an employer for nonpayment.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Sen. Jennifer Carroll Foy [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-11-28 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-11-28 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100119D |