VA HB37 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Towing motor vehicles; companion animals. Prohibits tow truck drivers and towing and recovery operators from knowingly towing a motor vehicle occupied by a companion animal.
Title
Towing motor vehicles; companion animals.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Transportation |
2016-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-11-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-11-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100210D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB37 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB37+hil |