VA HB360 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB360
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Continued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Continued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; voter-nominated open primary elections; ranked choice voting for certain elections. Establishes a voter-nominated primary election for the offices of Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Attorney General and for the General Assembly and the United States Senate and House of Representatives. A voter-nominated primary election is an election held for the purpose of selecting candidates to be on the ballot at a general election. All candidates, regardless of political party affiliation, are on a single ballot. The four candidates receiving the highest numbers of votes are the candidates for that office at the general election. The bill provides that a general or special election for such offices is conducted by ranked choice voting. Ranked choice voting is the method of casting and tabulating votes in which (i) voters rank candidates in order of preference, (ii) tabulation proceeds in sequential rounds in which last-place candidates are defeated, and (iii) the candidate with the most votes in the final round is elected.
Title
Elections; voter-nominated open primary elections, ranked choice voting for certain elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | Continued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101832D |
Same As/Similar To
HB360 (Carry Over) 2020-01-31 - Continued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 403.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 454 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 507.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 507.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 517 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 520 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 521 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 527 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 530 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 532 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 534 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 535 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 603.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 612.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 613 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 627 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 633 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 639 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 651 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 653 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 655 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 669 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 671 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 673 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 673.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 682 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 703.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 947.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 947.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 954 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 955.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB360 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB360+hil |