VA HB358 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0575)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0575)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Veteran-owned small businesses; waiving of fees. Directs the Secretary of Veterans and Defense Affairs and the Secretary of Commerce and Trade, in conjunction with the Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity, to examine the waiving of fees associated with permits necessary to establish a small business for veteran-owned small businesses.
Title
Veteran-owned small businesses; waiving of fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0575) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 575 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB358ER) |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-01-26 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-20 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100769D |
Same As/Similar To
SB572 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0595)
SB572 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0595)
SB572 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0595)