VA HB346 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB346
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity; definitions; small business. Redefines "small business" for the purposes of programs for the Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity and the Virginia Public Procurement Act to mean a business that together with its affiliates has both 250 or fewer employees and average annual gross receipts, less the cost of goods sold by the business, of $10 million or less averaged over the previous three years. Currently for these programs, a business qualifies as a small business if, together with its affiliates, it has either 250 or fewer employees or average annual gross receipts of $10 million or less averaged over the previous three years.
Title
Small Business and Supplier Diversity, Department of; redefines "small business."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in General Laws |
2020-02-06 | House | Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2020-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103149D |
Same As/Similar To
HB346 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1617 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB346 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB346+hil |