VA HB345 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Scottsville; town council and other town officers. Provides staggered elections for the town council and removes authority of the town council to appoint other police officers besides the town sergeant. The bill authorizes the town council to appoint a town administrator, and authorizes the town council to appoint one person to multiple offices. The bill changes the term "president of the council" to "vice-mayor" and includes female pronouns with all instances of male pronouns.
Title
Scottsville, Town of; amending charter, staggered elections for town council and other officers.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 125 (effective 3/4/20) | |
2020-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 4, 2020 | |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB345ER) |
2020-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 20102298D-E |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB345E |
2020-02-05 | House | Emergency clause added |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2020-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102298D |
Same As/Similar To
SB281 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1252)