VA HB34 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Railroads; crew size. Requires a train or light engine used in connection with the movement of railroad freight in the Commonwealth that shares the same rail corridor as a high-speed passenger or commuter train to operate with a crew of at least two individuals. Localities are prohibited from adopting an ordinance, order, or resolution in conflict with this requirement. The State Corporation Commission shall have discretion to fine a person willfully violating this requirement an amount not to exceed $500 for a first offense and an amount not to exceed $1,000 for a second offense or a subsequent offense. The measure has a sunset clause that provides that it will expire on the fifth day following the date that the Federal Railroad Administration issues a rule requiring two-person train crews on crude oil trains and establishing minimum crew size standards for most main line freight and passenger rail operations. The measure has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Railroads; freight train crew requirements, civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2018-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
2018-01-17HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-11-28HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-11-28HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100717D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback