VA HB332 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0298)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0298)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign Finance Disclosure Act; general provisions applicable to penalties. Provides that the Act's requirements for filing timely and complete statements and reports remain in full force and effect notwithstanding any pending investigation into activities of any candidate campaign committee, political committee, or participant in the committee.
Title
Campaign Finance Disclosure Act; general provisions applicable to penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0298) | |
2012-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 298 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB332ER) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-03 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-12 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101454D |