VA HB332 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Alternative onsite sewage systems; routine testing; who may test. Prohibits the Department of Health from requiring that owners of alternative onsite sewer systems with flows of less than or equal to 1,000 gallons per day and serving a single-family dwelling provide analyzed samples of effluent on a routine and recurring basis. The Board for Waterworks and Wastewater Works Operators and Onsite Sewage System Professionals must develop licensure for (i) employees or agents of licensed operators and (ii) owner-operators of an individual single-family dwelling that have demonstrated the competence and knowledge to operate, monitor, and maintain their own alternative onsite sewage system. Any professional engineer with a current license in the Commonwealth may elect to be deemed an owner-operator without the demonstration of further competence.
Title
Alternative onsite sewage systems; routine testing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-02-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-20 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #4 | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100951D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 163 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 164 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB332 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB332+hil |