VA HB330 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0948)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0948)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Covenants not to compete; low-wage employees; civil penalty. Prohibits an employer from entering into, enforcing, or threatening to enforce a covenant not to compete between the employer and a low-wage employee. The employer is subject to a civil penalty of $10,000 per violation. The bill defines "low-wage employee" as either (i) an employee, intern, student, apprentice, or trainee whose average weekly earnings are less than the average weekly wage of the Commonwealth or who is employed without pay or (ii) an independent contractor who is compensated for his services at an hourly rate that is less than the median hourly wage for the Commonwealth for all occupations as reported by the Bureau of Labor Statistics of the U.S. Department of Labor. The bill defines "covenant not to compete" as an agreement that restrains, prohibits, or otherwise restricts an individual's ability to compete with his former employer. The bill allows any low-wage employee subject to such a covenant not to compete to bring a civil action against an employer and seek appropriate relief, including enjoining the conduct of any person or employer, ordering payment of liquidated damages, and awarding lost compensation, damages, and reasonable attorney fees and costs. The bill provides that if the court finds a violation of the bill's provisions, the plaintiff is entitled to recover reasonable costs, including reasonable fees for expert witnesses, and attorney fees from the former employer or other person who attempts to enforce a covenant not to compete against such plaintiff. The bill requires all employers to post in the workplace a notice of the prohibition or a summary of the notice approved by the Department of Labor and Industry and provides that an employer is subject to a warning for a first offense and to a civil penalty for a subsequent offense for failure to post such notice or approved summary. The provisions of the bill are applicable to covenants not to compete entered into on or after July 1, 2020.
Title
Employment; covenants not to compete, definition of low-wage employees, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (30-Y 7-N) (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (86-Y 6-N) (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (86-Y 6-N) (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0948) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 948 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB330ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (30-Y 7-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Agree To (86-Y 6-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (86-Y 6-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Conference substitute printed 20109419D-H1 |
2020-03-04 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senators: DeSteph, Spruill, Bell |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | Delegates: VanValkenburg, Hurst, Webert |
2020-02-27 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-27 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20108476D-S1 (1-Y 96-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB330S1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108476D-S1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108476D-S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (95-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102056D |
Same As/Similar To
SB480 (Same As) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0949)