VA HB330 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Public elementary and secondary school students; topical sunscreen. Permits any public elementary or secondary school student to possess and use unscented topical sunscreen in its original packaging on a school bus, on school property, or at a school-sponsored event without a note or prescription from a licensed health care professional if the topical sunscreen is approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration for nonprescription use for the purpose of limiting damage to skin caused by exposure to ultraviolet light. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public elementary and secondary school students; use of unscented topical sunscreen.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30SenateLeft in Education and Health
2018-02-22SenateContinued to 2019 in Education and Health (8-Y 6-N)
2018-02-16SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-02HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB330H1
2018-02-01HouseEmergency clause added
2018-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18105957D-H1
2018-02-01HouseRead second time
2018-01-31HouseRead first time
2018-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 18105957D-H1
2018-01-29HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-04HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2018-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103321D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221274.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback