VA HB328 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program. Entitles Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program. Entitles individuals to a family and medical leave insurance (FMLI) benefit payment for each month they are engaged in qualified caregiving, not to exceed 60 qualified caregiving days per year. Qualified caregiving means an activity, except regular employment, for a reason an individual is entitled to leave under the federal Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993. Benefits would amount to 66 percent of an individual's monthly wages, based on highest annual earnings from the prior three years, up to a capped monthly amount, and would be indexed to the national average wage index. If a person takes the maximum number of days, the benefits would range from a minimum benefit of $580 to a maximum benefit of $4,000 per month in the program's first year. To be eligible for benefits, an individual is required to (i) be insured for disability insurance benefits under the Social Security Act at the time his application is filed; (ii) have earned income from employment during the 12 months before filing the application; (iii) have filed an application for a FMLI benefit; and (iv) have been engaged in qualified caregiving, or anticipate being so engaged, during the 90-day period before the application is filed or within 30 days thereafter. The measure establishes the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Fund and requires FMLI benefit payments to be made only from this Fund. A tax of 0.2 percent is imposed on the wages received by every individual, and an excise tax of 0.2 percent of the wages paid in any calendar year by the employer with respect to their employment is imposed on employers. The measure has a delayed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program; funding by employee and employer taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Appropriations
2020-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-30HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 9-N)
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
2020-01-01HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-01HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101001D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
602800(n/a)See Bill Text
602813(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback