VA HB325 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (8-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Reporting lost or stolen firearms; civil penalty. Repeals the requirement that, if a firearm is lost or stolen from a person who lawfully possessed it, such person shall report the loss or theft of the firearm to any local law-enforcement agency or the Department of State Police within 48 hours after such person discovers the loss or theft or is informed by a person with personal knowledge of the loss or theft. Under current law, a violation is punishable by a civil penalty of not more than $250.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; reporting lost or stolen, civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-28SenatePassed by indefinitely in Judiciary (8-Y 7-N)
2022-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2022-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2022-02-10HouseVOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N)
2022-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House (51-Y 48-N)
2022-02-09HouseRead second time and engrossed
2022-02-08HouseRead first time
2022-02-04HouseReported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N)
2022-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N)
2022-02-01HouseAssigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1
2022-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2022-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102189D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182287.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback