VA HB324 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0700)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0700)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Virtual School established. Establishes the Board of the Virginia Virtual School as a policy agency in the executive branch of state government for the purpose of governing the full-time virtual school programs offered to students enrolled in the Virginia Virtual School. The Secretary of Education is responsible for such agency. The 13-member Board is given operational control of the School and assigned powers and duties. The bill requires the School to be open to any school-age person in the Commonwealth and provide an educational program meeting the Standards of Quality for grades kindergarten through 12. The bill requires the average state share of Standards of Quality per pupil funding for each enrolled student to be transferred to the School. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2016, and will only become effective if reenacted by the 2016 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Virginia Virtual School; established, report, effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (61-Y 38-N) (Y: 63 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 33-N) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2015 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 33-N) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2015 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0700) | |
2015-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 700 (effective 7/1/16 see bill) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB324ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (61-Y 38-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15104581D-S2 (61-Y 38-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 33-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15104581D-S2 (63-Y 33-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 16-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB324S2 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104581D-S2 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 15101746D-S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104581D-S2 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 4-N) |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15101746D-S1 |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (5-Y 4-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Continued to 2015 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 34-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 14100834D-E |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB324E |
2014-02-10 | House | Pending question ordered |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendments (18-Y 3-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2014-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100834D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 212.23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 349.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 349.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 638 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |