VA HB317 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; per student enrollment-based funding; noncredit workforce training programs. Requires the per student enrollment-based funding provided to public institutions of higher education to include funding for each Virginia student enrolled in a noncredit workforce training program. Under current law, per student enrollment-based funding follows each Virginia undergraduate student.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; per student enrollment-based funding, noncredit workforce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Education |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100088D |
Subjects
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Students
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Students
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 1 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |