VA HB314 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0279)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State hospitals; discharge planning; report. Provides that (i) when an individual is to be discharged from Central State Hospital, Southwestern Virginia Mental Health Institute, or Southern Virginia Mental Health Institute in 30 days or less after admission, the appropriate community services board shall implement the discharge plan developed by the state facility and (ii) when an individual is to be discharged from any other state facility in 30 days or less after admission, or from a state hospital more than 30 days after admission, the appropriate community services board or behavioral health authority shall be responsible for the individual's discharge planning. Under current law, community services boards and behavioral health authorities provide discharge planning for all individuals discharged from state hospitals, regardless of the duration of their stay. The bill requires the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to make certain annual reports by August 1 to the Governor and the General Assembly and to provide the General Assembly with a one-time evaluation of the impacts of the changes to discharge planning implemented by the bill by November 1, 2025. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State hospitals; discharge planning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-02 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0279)
2024-04-02 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 279 (effective 1/1/25)
2024-03-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024
2024-03-27HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024
2024-03-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2024-03-25SenateSigned by President
2024-03-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB314ER)
2024-03-25HouseEnrolled
2024-03-05SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2024-03-05SenateRead third time
2024-03-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2024-02-29SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
2024-02-15SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2024-02-15SenateReported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
2024-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2024-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2024-02-07HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2024-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2024-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB314H1
2024-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 24106488D-H1
2024-02-06HouseRead second time
2024-02-05HouseRead first time
2024-02-01HouseReported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2024-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 24106488D-H1
2024-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2024-01-17HouseAssigned sub: Health
2024-01-05HouseReferred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2024-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103986D

Same As/Similar To

SB179 (Similar To) 2024-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0153)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
372505(n/a)See Bill Text
372837(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HB314
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB314+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB314H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB314ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+CHAP0279+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/24106488D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/24106488D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB314FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB314FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H2401V0018+HB0314
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H24V0080+HB0314
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+HV0348+HB0314
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+S04V0161+HB0314
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+S05V0511+HB0314
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0926HB0314+HB0314
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0955HB0314+HB0314

Bill Comments

feedback