VA HB313 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0239)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0239)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prescription Monitoring Program; prescriber and dispenser patterns. Requires the Director of the Department of Health Professions to annually review controlled substance prescribing and dispensing patterns. The bill requires the Director to conduct such review in consultation with an advisory panel consisting of representatives from the relevant health regulatory boards, the Department of Health, the Department of Medical Assistance Services, and the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. The bill requires the Director to make any necessary changes to the criteria for unusual patterns of prescribing and dispensing and report any findings and recommendations for best practices to the Joint Commission on Health Care by November 1 of each year. This bill is identical to SB 728.
Title
Prescription Monitoring Program; prescriber and dispenser patterns, annual review, report.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute HB313S1 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute HB313S1 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0239) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 239 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB313ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107187D-S1 (98-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute HB313S1 (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB313S1 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107187D-S1 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107187D-S1 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB313H1 |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105795D-H1 |
2018-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105795D-H1 |
2018-01-25 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101252D |