VA HB31 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Primary elections; voter registration by political party. Adds party affiliation to the information that an applicant is asked to provide when registering to vote. The applicant may indicate that he is an independent. Voters registered prior to January 1, 2015, will be designated as independent unless they provide a political party designation in writing to the general registrar. Voters may change their party affiliation or independent status by written notice at any time before the registration records are closed prior to an election. The state party chairman of each political party must notify the State Board of Elections by January 31 of each year of the party rules governing who may participate in the party's primaries held from April 1 of that year and through March 31 of the following year.
Title
Primary elections; voter registration by political party, additional information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2014-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments Subcommittee |
2013-11-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-11-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100048D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 418.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 423.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 516.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 530 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 535 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB31 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB31+hil |