VA HB31 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health benefits plans offered by foreign health insurers. Authorizes any foreign health insurer approved by any other state to sell a group health benefits plan that is offered in the insurer's domiciliary state to sell to persons in Virginia any health benefits plan that has been approved by another state.
Title
Health benefits plans; sale by foreign health insurers to persons in State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #1 | |
2009-12-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2009-12-18 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100534D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 1802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 6400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 6408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB31 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB31+hil |