VA HB305 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB305
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; State Board of Elections; membership; appointment of Commissioner of Elections. Makes the State Board of Elections responsible for appointing the Commissioner of Elections and removes the Governor's ability to appoint to the Department of Elections a deputy commissioner or a confidential policy advisor. The bill also increases the State Board of Elections from five members to seven and staggers those initial terms so that three members are appointed in 2023 and every four years thereafter, two members are appointed in 2024 and every four years thereafter, and two members are appointed in 2025 and every four years thereafter. Elections; State Board of Elections; membership; appointment of Commissioner of Elections. Makes the State Board of Elections responsible for appointing the Commissioner of Elections and removes the Governor's ability to appoint to the Department of Elections a deputy commissioner or a confidential policy advisor. The bill also increases the State Board of Elections from five members to seven and staggers those initial terms so that three members are appointed in 2023 and every four years thereafter, two members are appointed in 2024 and every four years thereafter, and two members are appointed in 2025 and every four years thereafter.
Title
Elections; appointment of Commissioner of Elections, membership of Board, effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Vogel, Ebbin, McClellan |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Ransone, Adams, L.R., Adams, D.M. |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-09 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 96-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 22106858D-S1 (0-Y 96-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB305S1 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106858D-S1 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106858D-S1 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB305H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106209D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106209D-H1 |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100777D |
Same As/Similar To
HB305 (Carry Over) 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 411.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 427 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 643 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 653 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 653.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 671.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 707.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 707.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 709 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 709.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |