VA HB3 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (5-Y 7-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (5-Y 7-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (voter referendum); charter schools. Provides for a referendum at the November 8, 2016, election to approve or reject an amendment to grant the Board of Education the authority to establish charter schools within the school divisions of the Commonwealth, subject to any criteria or conditions that the General Assembly may prescribe.
Title
Constitutional amendment; charter schools (submitting to qualified voters).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (5-Y 7-N 1-A) (Y: 5 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (5-Y 7-N 1-A) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-15 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (50-Y 48-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (50-Y 48-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-08 | House | Passed by until Friday, February 12, 2016 |
2016-02-02 | House | Passed by until Monday, February 8, 2016 |
2016-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-29 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 9-N) |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-11-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100596D |