VA HB294 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Education improvement scholarship tax credits; eligible students in need of a safer school environment. Declares eligible for a scholarship from a scholarship foundation that receives an education improvement scholarship tax credit, on the same basis as any other eligible student, eligible students in need of a safer school environment, defined in the bill as any student who, while enrolled in a public elementary or secondary school in kindergarten through grade 12, was the victim of assault, battery, bullying, harassment, hazing, kidnapping, or robbery on school property, on a school bus, or at a school-sponsored activity, as substantiated by an investigation and written report by the school principal. The bill provides that (i) eligible students in need of a safer school environment are permitted to use such scholarships to cover the expenses associated with attending another public school within or outside of his school division of residence and (ii) there are no family income restrictions on scholarships for eligible students in need of a safer school environment. The bill clarifies that no public elementary or secondary school or local school division is prohibited or precluded from offering various educational alternatives to an eligible student in need of a safer school environment. Education improvement scholarship tax credits; eligible students in need of a safer school environment. Declares eligible for a scholarship from a scholarship foundation that receives an education improvement scholarship tax credit, on the same basis as any other eligible student, eligible students in need of a safer school environment, defined in the bill as any student who, while enrolled in a public elementary or secondary school in kindergarten through grade 12, was the victim of assault, battery, bullying, harassment, hazing, kidnapping, or robbery on school property, on a school bus, or at a school-sponsored activity, as substantiated by an investigation and written report by the school principal. The bill provides that (i) eligible students in need of a safer school environment are permitted to use such scholarships to cover the expenses associated with attending another public school within or outside of his school division of residence and (ii) there are no family income restrictions on scholarships for eligible students in need of a safer school environment. The bill clarifies that no public elementary or secondary school or local school division is prohibited or precluded from offering various educational alternatives to an eligible student in need of a safer school environment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education improvement scholarship tax credit; eligible students in need of safer school environment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-24SenatePassed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
2022-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2022-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2022-02-04HouseVOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N)
2022-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (52-Y 48-N)
2022-02-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB294H1
2022-02-03HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 22105322D-H1
2022-02-03HouseRead second time
2022-02-02HouseRead first time
2022-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 22105322D-H1
2022-01-31HouseReported from Education with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
2022-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2022-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: K-12
2022-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2022-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102136D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581439.25(n/a)See Bill Text
581439.28(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback