VA HB293 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Administration of the circuit court system; authority of circuit court judges. Clarifies that the executive secretary's responsibility as administrator of the circuit court system does not supersede the authority of the circuit court judges over running the court itself (e.g., setting terms of court, dockets, control of the courtroom, etc.).
Title
Circuit courts and judges; clarifies authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Failed to pass in House | |
2010-03-14 | House: No further action taken | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill and substitute returned to the House of Delegates | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Chair ruled that bill is not properly before the Senate | |
2010-03-11 | House: Speaker ruled Senate substitute 10105866D-S1 not germane | |
2010-03-11 | House: Passed by temporarily | |
2010-03-10 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 2-N) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB293S1 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105866D-S1 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105866D-S1 | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (85-Y 13-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House (85-Y 13-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 2-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Judicial Systems | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102790D |