VA HB292 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Voter registration; preregistration for persons age 16 or older. Permits a person who is otherwise qualified to register to vote and is 16 years of age or older, but who will not be 18 years of age on or before the day of the next general election, to preregister to vote. The preregistration does not entitle such a person to vote in any election except as already permitted by law. The Department of Elections is required to maintain a record of all preregistered voters in the Virginia voter registration system, which shall automatically register a person who is preregistered upon that person's reaching 18 years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration; preregistration for persons age 16 or older.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-16HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2016-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote
2016-01-14HouseAssigned P & E sub: Elections
2016-01-04HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2016-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102602D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242403(n/a)See Bill Text
242404(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback