VA HB291 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0404)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0404)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appeal of bail decision. Specifies the court to which a bail decision, bond amount, or term of recognizance should be appealed. The proper court is determined based on where the initial determination was made and the court in which the charge is pending. The bill also streamlines the process by which an attorney for the Commonwealth makes a motion to increase bail.
Title
Bail decision; specifies court which bond amount or term of recognizance should be appealed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (2-Y 94-N) (Y: 2 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (2-Y 94-N) (Y: 2 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0404) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 404 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB291ER) | |
2010-03-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-12 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-12 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-12 | House: Conference substitute printed 10106035D-H2 | |
2010-03-11 | House: Delegates: Griffith, Gilbert, Johnson | |
2010-03-11 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Senators: Marsh, Petersen, Quayle | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2010-03-11 | House: House acceded to request | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-11 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (2-Y 94-N) | |
2010-03-11 | House: Senate substitute rejected by House 10105972D-S1 (2-Y 94-N) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB291S1 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105972D-S1 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105972D-S1 | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-02 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB291H1 | |
2010-02-01 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104646D-H1 | |
2010-02-01 | House: Read second time | |
2010-01-29 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-27 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104646D-H1 | |
2010-01-27 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103475D |
Same As/Similar To
SB75 (Same As) 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0592)