VA HB29 | 2022 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB29
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
Summary
Budget Bill. Amends Chapter 552 of the 2021 Acts of Assembly, Special Session I, as amended by Chapter 1 of the 2021 Acts of Assembly, Special Session II.
Title
Budget Bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's Amendments # 1,2 and 3 (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (93-Y 2-N) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 1-N) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Fin and Approp with amendments substituted for House amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Pass By (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Pass By (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (93-Y 2-N) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 1-N) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Fin and Approp with amendments substituted for House amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Pass By (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Pass By (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001) | |
2022-06-17 | House | Enacted, Chapter 1 (effective 6/17/21) |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2022-06-17 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2022-06-17 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB29ER2) |
2022-06-17 | House | Reenrolled |
2022-06-17 | Governor: Governor's recommendations adopted | |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's Amendments # 1,2 and 3 (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-06-17 | House | VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 1-N) |
2022-06-17 | House | House concurred in Governor's Amendments # 1, 2, and 3 (95-Y 1-N) |
2022-06-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-06-17 | House | Enacted, Chapter 1 (effective 7/1/21) |
2022-06-15 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2022-06-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., June 16, 2022 | |
2022-06-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on June 9, 2022 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-06-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-06-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB29ER) |
2022-06-09 | House | Enrolled |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 1-N) |
2022-06-01 | House | VOTE: Adoption (93-Y 2-N) |
2022-06-01 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 2-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senators: Howell, Barker, Hanger, Locke, Lucas, Newman, Norment, Saslaw |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Delegates: Knight, Austin, Bloxom, Brewer, Torian, Sickles |
2022-03-02 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-02 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 98-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Fin and Approp with amendments substituted for House amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | VOTE: Agree To (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | Constitutional reading dispensed (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | VOTE: Pass By (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | Motion to pass by floor amendment to Item 27.20 #2h agreed to (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | VOTE: Pass By (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | Motion to pass by floor amendment to Item 27.20 #1h agreed to (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | VOTE: Agree To (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | Uncontested committee amendments agreed to BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | VOTE: Agree To (96-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Motion for Special and Continuing Order (96-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-20 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Budget amendments available |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-12-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103423D |
Same As/Similar To
HB29 (Carry Over) 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455