VA HB289 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; indexing brackets and exemptions. Starting with taxable year 2022, indexes income tax brackets, the personal exemption, and the additional personal exemption for the blind or the aged. The bill requires the indexing ratio to be based on any increase in the Chained Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers (C-CPI-U) compared with 2021 as a reference year; however, the indexing ratio shall not be less than zero and therefore does not function to reduce any bracket or exemption.
Title
Income tax, state; indexing brackets and exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Finance |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103394D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 322.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |