VA HB287 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mediation. Provides that, where a referral to mediation includes both custody or visitation and child or spousal support, the referral to mediation is considered to be two separate appointments.
Title
Mediation; fee paid to mediators appointed in certain cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507) | |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 507 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB287ER) |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Printed as engrossed 16102129D-E |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB287E |
2016-02-15 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 6-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102129D |