VA HB283 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0313)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0313)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Richmond; office of the inspector general; city auditor. Creates an office of the inspector general for the City of Richmond. The inspector general shall be appointed by the council, and the duties of the inspector general shall be to conduct such investigations as are authorized by the Code of Virginia for a local government auditor. The bill authorizes the inspector general, in the conduct of such investigation, to order the attendance of any person as a witness and the production by any person of all relevant books and papers. The bill also authorizes the city auditor to appoint such accountants and other assistants for the performance of the duties of the city auditor's office as the council may provide for and sets out the duty of the city auditor to examine and audit all accounts, books, records, and financial transactions of the city, and of any department, board, commission, office, or agency thereof, including all trust funds, special funds, and other funds. This bill is identical to SB 356.
Title
Richmond, City of; amending charter, creates office of the inspector general.
Sponsors
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] |
Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0313) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 313 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB283ER) |
2018-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102115D |