VA HB281 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB281

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Prisoners; medical care. Eliminates the Department of Corrections prisoner co-payment program for nonemergency health care services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prisoners; medical care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 31-N) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (15-Y 2-N) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25SenateContinued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N)
2020-02-21SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-21SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 4-N)
2020-02-17SenateAssigned Rehab sub: Social Service and Corrections
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Passage (68-Y 31-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (68-Y 31-N)
2020-02-06HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-03HouseReported from Appropriations (15-Y 2-N)
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-24HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
2020-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-24HouseReported from Public Safety (14-Y 8-N)
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned PS sub: Public Safety
2019-12-30HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2019-12-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100702D

Same As/Similar To

HB281 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53132(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback