VA HB2803 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; naloxone. Authorizes employees of a public institution of higher education who have completed a training program to possess and administer naloxone. The bill requires the governing board of each public institution of higher education to develop and implement policies that require at least one employee at each housing facility and health center owned or controlled by the institution to possess naloxone for administration to a person who is believed to be experiencing or about to experience a life-threatening opioid overdose.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; employees with training to administer naloxone.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19101039D |