VA HB2795 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Handheld photo speed monitoring devices. Provides that the Department of State Police may operate a handheld photo speed monitoring device, defined in the bill, in or around a highway work zone for the purpose of recording images of vehicles that are traveling at speeds of at least 12 miles per hour above the posted highway work zone speed limit within such highway work zone when (i) workers are present and (ii) such highway work zone is indicated by appropriately placed signs displaying the maximum speed limit and the use of such handheld automated speed monitoring device. The bill also provides that the operator of a vehicle shall be liable for a monetary civil penalty, not to exceed $125, if such vehicle is found to be traveling at speeds of at least 12 miles per hour above the posted highway work zone speed limit by the handheld photo monitoring device.
Title
Handheld photo speed monitoring devices; DSP may operate in or around a highway work zone.
Sponsors
Del. Luke Torian [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Transportation |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19105198D |